CYMRU FOOTBALL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports the development of football facilities in Wales through the offering of grants to successful applicants to provide inspirational fit-for-future football facilities that will improve and grow Welsh football on and off the pitch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£9,229,117
Donations and legacies | £8.94m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £288.45k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,198,283
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.20m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,958,168 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.20m | |
Retained for future use | £1.03m |
People

6 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 02 September 1996: Standard registration
- FAW TRUST (Working name)
- FAW FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annaliese Lewis | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wyn Lewis | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrew Williams | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Hannah Kate Buckley | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen White | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee James | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Lloyd Williams | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Davies | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14m | £3.99m | £5.94m | £8.45m | £9.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.94m | £3.01m | £6.10m | £5.30m | £8.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.50m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.11m | £1.22m | N/A | £4.75m | £7.96m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.70m | £2.98m | £3.59m | £8.00m | £8.94m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £234.35k | £0 | £424.98k | £43.29k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.17m | £1.01m | £1.91m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £2.98m | £3.59m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.03k | £9.30k | £12.37k | £101.13k | £288.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £19.66k | £0 | £0 | £306.36k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.91m | £2.96m | £6.06m | £5.00m | £8.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £26.94k | £41.85k | £39.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £80.63k | £51.68k | £66.85k | £20.42k | £10.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.53m | £8.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £294.61k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £31.64k | £36.10k | £21.81k | £3.62k | £5.14k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £3.11m | £4.28m | £3.62m | £9.31m | £13.81m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.75m | £1.93m | £1.41m | £3.93m | £7.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JANUARY 2003 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2006, 7 MARCH 2008 AND 29 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 AUG 2020 as amended on 09 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
a) To assist in the planning, funding and provision of new facilities, or the improvement of existing facilities, in any part of Wales related to the playing of association football, or other games or sports and thereby to assist in ensuring that due attention is given to the physical education and development of participants. b) To further the promotion of community participation in healthy physical recreation with specific reference to improving social welfare amongst disadvantaged communities, immigrants and refugees, those communities which feel under-represented or not naturally attracted to football or other games or sports. c) To support and promote targeted participation and accessibility strategies, equality, diversity and inclusion strategies and sustainability and social responsibility strategies (including health, education and community development covering all ages) including social cohesion and using the power of football to bring communities together. d)To undertake any actions, activities or services which are complementary to or in any way related to the achievement of the above.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRAGON PARK
FOOTBALL DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
NEWPORT INTERNATIONAL SPORTS VILL
NEWPORT
UK
NP19 4RA
- Phone:
- 01633282911
- Email:
- info@cff.cymru
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window