ISLAND BWO

Charity number: 1057869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.00k £3.40k £19.08k £23.45k £22.39k
Total expenditure £10.12k £3.31k £7.84k £24.74k £22.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A