Financial history BRITISH MEDICAL ACUPUNCTURE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1057942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £529.44k £508.48k £507.73k £384.32k £437.47k
Total expenditure £583.44k £574.96k £500.99k £403.85k £343.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £177.26k £18 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £331.22k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £523.36k £0 £500.76k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £6.08k £0 £6.95k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £477.39k £460.48k £453.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £106.04k £114.47k £47.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.91k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £6.25k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £2.18k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A