BITTAFORD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1057947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.90k £10.27k £8.65k £7.73k £11.22k
Total expenditure £8.60k £10.33k £10.42k £9.52k £6.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £400 N/A N/A £10.00k