Financial history RUTH WINSTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1057968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £127.48k £137.88k £120.39k £41.70k £99.63k
Total expenditure £145.49k £142.31k £145.78k £79.44k £127.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £21.44k N/A