Linked charities RUTH WINSTON CENTRE
Charity number: 1057968

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT 16 JANUARY 1961, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 APRIL 2021, 26 JANUARY 2022 AND 7TH APRIL 2023.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OUT OF ITS INCOME OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE ,SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO PERSONS AGED 50 YEARS AND OVER (“ OLDER PERSONS”) WHO HAVE HAD CONTINUOUS RESIDENCE FOR THE IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THREE YEARS WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND THOSE PARTS OF THE POSTAL CODE AREAS EN4, N11, N13, N14, N17 AND N22 WHICH ARE NOT WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD BUT ARE WITHIN EITHER THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS:
(A) BY GRANTS OF MONEY TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY DOMESTIC HELP AND ASSISTANCE WITH GARDENING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION FOLLOWING EITHER DISCHARGE FROM HOSPITAL OR AN INJURY OR ILLNESS WHERE THE APPLICANT WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SAME.
(B) BY GRANTS OF MONEY TO FACILITATE THE PURCHASE OF FOOD AND/OR HOUSEHOLD NECESSITIES WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING THE TEMPORARY FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF AN APPLICANT WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACQUIRE THE SAME.
(C) BY GRANTS OF MONEY TO FACILITATE THE PURCHASE OF ANY HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT TO ACHIEVE A REASONABLE LIVING STANDARD AND WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNAVAILABLE TO AN APPLICANT.
(D) BY GRANTS OF MONEY TO ASSIST AN APPLICANT IN DISCHARGING THE EXPENSES OF CONVALESCENCE INCLUDING TRANSPORT WHICH HAS BEEN MEDICALLY ADVISED AND WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNAVAILABLE TO AN APPLICANT.
(E) BY GRANTS OF MONEY TO ASSIST AN APPLICANT IN ACQUIRING ANY MOBILITY EQUIPMENT WHICH HAS BEEN MEDICALLY ADVISED AND WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNAVAILABLE TO AN APPLICANT.
(F) BY THE PROVISION OF IT EQUIPMENT TO FACILITATE THE RECIPIENT WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACQUIRE THE SAME JOINING IN THE ACTIVITIES AT THE RUTH WINSTON CENTRE AND/ OR COMMUNICATING WITH OTHER MEMBERS OF THE RUTH WINSTON CENTRE AND IF THE RECIPIENT IS HOUSEBOUND THE PROVISION OF BASIC INSTRUCTION IN ITS USE.
(G) BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT TO AND FROM THE RUTH WINSTON CENTRE OR ANY VENUES BEING VISITED BY OLDER PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO ENABLE THE RECIPIENT TO JOIN IN ACTIVITIES AT THE RUTH WINSTON CENTRE.
(H) AND FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING, DISABILITY, INFIRMITY OR WANT AMONGST INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND IN THOSE PARTS OF THE POSTAL CODE AREAS EN4, N11, N13, N14, N17 AND N22 WHICH ARE NOT WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD BUT ARE WITHIN EITHER THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY.
Registration history
- 05 June 1964 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.