FRIENDS OF DUNBURY ACADEMY (FODA)

Charity number: 1057974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required