Accounts and annual returns ST JAMES WARTER PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1058064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 17 March 2022 On time
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required