Financial history ST JAMES WARTER PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1058064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.57k £1.39k £3.03k £2.19k £1.51k
Total expenditure £23.99k £23.88k £24.27k £24.72k £24.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A