Financial history ZAPALLAL SHARING THE STRUGGLE

Charity number: 1058100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.12k £10.31k £7.77k £7.12k £7.12k
Total expenditure £8.09k £4.55k £6.86k £3.40k £10.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A