ASSOCIATION OF THE TURKISH PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping elderly community mainly Turkish and providing them with services such as shopping,cooking,cleaning and organise tours to help them socialise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 20 September 1996: Standard registration
- 20 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.75k | £6.25k | £5.68k | £0 | £30.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £6.10k | £5.61k | £0 | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TURKISH COMMUNITY IN THE U.K. BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTRESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window