Financial history EMPOWER GLOBAL

Charity number: 1058285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.13m £1.13m £1.43m £1.26m £1.08m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.15m £1.19m £1.08m £1.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.13k N/A £3.90k £39.71k £54.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £1.11m £1.25m £1.23m £1.07m
Income - Other trading activities £18.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £15.76k £15.34k £7.99k £12.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £317 £226 £330 £232 £348
Income - Other £0 £0 £164.45k £24.95k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.15m £1.19m £1.08m £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.16k £6.03k £5.82k £5.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £14.39k £0 £0 £43.03k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0