Financial history CLC INTERNATIONAL OFFICE

Charity number: 1058306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £526.89k £381.52k £565.59k £403.54k £472.14k
Total expenditure £518.52k £468.96k £586.61k £385.06k £398.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £370.12k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £520.53k N/A £193.69k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £4.48k N/A £1.78k N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.89k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £518.31k N/A £586.61k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £206 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.06k N/A £9.04k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £376.22k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £206 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A