ANIMAL SAMARITANS MIDLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1058312
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 February 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 February 2020 21 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 March 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 18 March 2019 41 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 March 2019 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 March 2019 406 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 02 August 2017 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 02 August 2017 178 days late Download