CREIGIAU COMMUNITY COMMITTEE / PWYLLGOR CANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL CREIGIAU

Charity number: 1058436
Charity reporting is overdue by 1488 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Annual return 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1123 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1123 days
Annual return 31 October 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1488 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1488 days