TRAFFORD RENT GUARANTEE SCHEME
Charity number: 1058452
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 October 1996: Standard registration
- 04 October 2002: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- TRGS (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED 20 FEBRUARY 1996 AND 3 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN THE BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMADATION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.