Accounts and annual returns UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM

Charity number: 1058483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window