Financial history CITY OF LONDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1058484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £120 £32 £62 £94 £26
Total expenditure £6.01k £6.06k £6.06k £6.06k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A