THE BRIDGEWATER HALL COMMUNITY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bridgewater Hall Community Education Trust exists to maximise the educational potential of Manchester's world class concert venues through a wide range of projects, programmes and activities which take the building and its rich artistic life, as their stimulus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 07 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE OXENBURGH | Chair | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Beko | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Harrington | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Tan | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.65k | £2.19k | £290 | £250 | £2.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.45k | £2.75k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 August 2022 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 July 2021 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING, SUPPORTING, ASSISTING AND CO-ORDINATING EDUCATIONAL AND ARTISTIC PROJECTS AND EVENTS IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ACTIVITIES RELATED TO OR CONNECTED WITH THE BRIDGEWATER HALL MANCHESTER. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BRIDGEWATER HALL
LOWER MOSLEY STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 3WS
- Phone:
- 0161 907 9074
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window