THE CALMCOTT TRUST

Charity number: 1058522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required