GOOD HOPE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1058533
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006

Total income: £1,944,561
Total expenditure: £587,432

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1997: Standard registration
  • 27 September 2007: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 27 September 2007: Funds transferred to 1052330 HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHAR...
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • GOOD HOPE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006
Total gross income £380.99k £375.70k £1.94m
Total expenditure £317.12k £293.36k £587.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A
Other assets N/A N/A N/A
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 08 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 29 September 2004 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/2/97
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES, PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH GOOD HOPE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST, WHICH WILL FURTHER THE FOLLOWING AIMS: 1) THE INVESTIGATION OF THE CAUSES OF CANCER AND THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT, CURE AND DEFEAT OF CANCER IN ALL ITS FORMS; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN TOPICS RELATED TO CANCER; 3) THE FURTHERANCE OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN ALL ITS FORMS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 April 1997 : Standard registration
  • 27 September 2007 : Removed
  • 27 September 2007 : Asset transfer out