THE UNITED KINGDOM COUNCIL FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity number: 1058545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 28 July 2017 On time Download