Trustees THE UNITED KINGDOM COUNCIL FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY
Charity number: 1058545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christian Philip Buckland | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ayling | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Graham White | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Courtenay Young | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Briggs | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Gregory | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Mary Donovan | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Daniel-Braham | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Fitzgerald | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.