WEST LONDON YMCA

Charity number: 1058593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.67m £6.74m £6.47m £7.37m £7.71m
Total expenditure £6.42m £6.75m £6.65m £6.61m £7.47m
Income from government contracts £5.90m £5.58m £1.76m £1.85m £1.51m
Income from government grants £0 £284.26k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £21.13k £5.22k £1.11k £6.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £649.34k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.90m £5.86m £6.46m £6.61m £7.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £427 £289 £4.02k £11.62k
Income - Other £773.63k £200.71k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.42m £5.29m £6.64m £6.61m £7.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £205 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £180.36k £0 £19.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.46m £0 £0 £219.28k