ST WILFRID'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (YORK) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 05 April 2017 On time Download