THE ST. LAWRENCE'S CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1058655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.81k £8.13k £7.25k £8.38k £5.37k
Total expenditure £8.02k £8.07k £4.14k £14.65k £3.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A