Accounts and annual returns BURFORD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058658
Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1063 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1063 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1428 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1428 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1794 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1794 days