Financial history BURFORD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058658
Charity reporting is overdue by 1816 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £19.44k £21.37k £16.74k £16.10k £8.04k
Total expenditure £19.59k £20.45k £21.67k £14.56k £5.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A