GLEBELAND COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATIION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community based events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 October 1996: Standard registration
- GLEBELAND CP SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Brown | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nikola Bodmer-Tripp | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89k | £1.91k | £2.05k | £9.86k | £343 | |
|
Total expenditure | £679 | £996 | £2.08k | £6.92k | £188 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15TH NOVEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BECCLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glebeland C P School
Yarmouth Road
Toft Monks
BECCLES
NR34 0EW
- Phone:
- 01502 677354
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window