IPSWICH ARTHRITIS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS TO BENEFIT PEOPLE WITH RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS IN THE IPSWICH AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 October 1996: Standard registration
- 17 December 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 December 2015: Funds transferred to 1048827 EAST SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX NHS FOUNDATION TRUST ...
- IAF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £710 | £0 | £0 | £150 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.67k | £0 | £0 | £2.80k | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 28 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 13 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 04 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 26 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5TH SEPTEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE RELATING TO EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS ARTHRITIS SUFFERS AND PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MUSCULO SKELETAL DISEASE, IN THE IPSWICH AND EAST SUFFOLK AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window