Financial history MISS MARJORIE E.ROUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1058771
Charity reporting is up to date (122 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £35.19k £14.21k £9.89k £10.35k £10.10k
Total expenditure £14.09k £7.09k £23.86k £8.07k £23.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A