2ND LONGTON (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1058860
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 March 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required