STANTON VALE FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (S.V.F.A.)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stanton Vale Friends Association is a group of likeminded staff and parents that wish to raise money to support the work of Stanton Vale school. In the past money has been raised to pay for a safe mobility / play area, adapted cookers as well as a defibrillator that benefits not just the school but the local community. The Association is currently raising money towards adaptive play equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 01 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSICA CHARLOTTE WALKER | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Miller | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.66k | £10.29k | £18.47k | £8.14k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.81k | £4.51k | £2.30k | £809 | £27.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanton Vale Special School
Thoresby Road
Long Eaton
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 3NP
- Phone:
- 01159729769
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window