THE RAILWAY CHILDREN

Charity number: 1058991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £3.68m £4.26m £4.46m £4.56m £4.90m
Total expenditure £3.79m £3.81m £4.58m £4.78m £4.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £171.90k £585.90k £1.02m £990.96k £958.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.88m £1.87m £1.51m £1.82m £2.17m
Income - Other trading activities £760.32k £457.31k £510.75k £553.13k £151.26k
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.93m £2.43m £2.17m £2.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £20.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.15k £9.06k £11.23k £15.99k £7.59k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £182.37k £36.89k £0 £14.95k £83.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.89m £3.01m £3.61m £3.82m £3.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £901.10k £800.69k £967.08k £953.59k £906.44k
Expenditure - Governance £61.78k £110.88k £154.92k £72.25k £67.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.19m £852.71k £1.02m £1.11m £968.44k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0