NORMANDY VETERANS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND - NORTH WALES COAST BRANCH (NO.94)

Charity number: 1059010
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Welfare of Normandy Veterans and their widows

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014

Total income: £1,219
Total expenditure: £3,522

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Denbighshire
  • Flintshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 1996: Standard registration
  • 21 March 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 21 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1084189 BRITISH LIMBLESS EX-SERVICE MEN'S ASSOCIATION (BLE...
  • 21 March 2017: Funds transferred to 216227 BLIND VETERANS UK
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NVA NORTH WALES COAST BRANCH - BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £10.45k £4.52k £2.34k £2.05k £1.22k
Total expenditure £10.91k £4.81k £5.38k £2.05k £3.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 12 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 02 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required