Financial history RICHARD HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1059029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.45m £3.00m £4.32m £4.74m £3.85m
Total expenditure £3.45m £3.58m £3.91m £3.99m £4.31m
Income from government contracts £868.43k £563.39k £369.11k £1.12m £1.34m
Income from government grants N/A £338.35k £882.90k £1.07m £499.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.03m £1.46m £2.19m £2.15m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £523.95k £625.66k £874.17k £382.83k £647.48k
Income - Charitable activities £868.43k £901.74k £1.25m £2.19m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.44k £11.73k £5.82k £14.90k £1.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £14.32k £156.48k £497.95k £219.24k £129.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.07m £2.30m £2.59m £2.80m £2.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.38m £811.66k £888.12k £690.49k £1.34m
Expenditure - Governance £34.61k £33.65k £32.60k £36.43k £34.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £463.37k £435.22k £498.14k £0