Financial history ST BEES VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1059041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.34k £5.17k £6.67k £13.98k £24.94k
Total expenditure £5.75k £5.80k £5.43k £7.55k £27.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.33k £17.80k