Accounts and annual returns THE SHUMON MOMEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1059056
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 May 2023 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required