Financial history THE SHUMON MOMEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1059056
Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £570 £600 £254 £500 £1
Total expenditure £500 £500 £0 £500 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A