Financial history PARISH OF OXFORD ST MATTHEW BRIDGE BUILDER TRUST

Charity number: 1059059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.62k £3.87k £3.49k £2.77k £6.04k
Total expenditure £9.19k £41.91k £43.32k £4.25k £10.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A