Trustees PARISH OF OXFORD ST MATTHEW BRIDGE BUILDER TRUST

Charity number: 1059059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jennifer Ruth Wigley Williams Chair 11 September 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW OXFORD
Received: On time
Alice Elisabeth Ruth Boughton Trustee 18 July 2021
None on record
Katherine Hayley Louise Kettle Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Sue Ann Matthew Trustee 06 February 2019
THE GLADSTONE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Nicola Rayner Trustee 23 July 2018
SPURGEONS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW OXFORD
Received: On time
NICHOLAS WANSEY WILSON Trustee 16 October 2011
None on record
Dr ALAN MALCOLM MCCULLOUGH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW OXFORD
Received: On time
REV JANE SHERWOOD Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW OXFORD
Received: On time
ANDREW WARNER SMITH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW OXFORD
Received: On time