Trustees THE MUSLIM CULTURAL HERITAGE CENTRE (MCHC) TRUST
Charity number: 1059085

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esmail Jasat | Chair | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Khadra Said | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marouane Benchekroun | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muna Mohamed Ali | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdelilah Sirokh | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mustafa Abu-Lisan DL | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Kasim Mohamed Ali | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Neil Hargreaves | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABDULKARIM KHALIL | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.