Accounts and annual returns ST. OSYTH HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1059097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2022 21 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2020 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 Not Required