HEADLEY HEATH NEW LIFE CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Being a church our first objective is the preaching of the gospel of our Lord and saviour Jesus Christ within our local community. Whether it be by services or Sunday school youth groups, youth & children activities, taking morning assemblies in the local school. Services to the elderly in nursing homes, financial support to overseas missionary work in developing nations, famine/earthquake appeals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 11 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel ann pauline langley | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Marie Russell | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATRICIA BULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
REVEREND MALCOLM PAUL WESLEY BULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENNETH BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.69k | £31.51k | £49.97k | £52.49k | £42.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.55k | £26.89k | £33.00k | £63.16k | £67.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 OCTOBER 1996 as amended on 13 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1) Advancement of the Christian faith in the United Kingdom 2) The relief of persons who are in conditions of need hardship or distress or who are aged or sick
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Life Church Centre
Middle Lane
Headley Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B38 0DG
- Phone:
- 07881 978396
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window