Ashbourne Primary School Parent Teacher Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of fund-raising events. Organisation of, and assistance with, school activities. Funding of, and participation in, beneficial projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 November 1996: Standard registration
- PARKSIDE P T A (Working name)
- PARKSIDE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION ASHBOURNE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kara Niven | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.05k | £2.02k | £4.40k | £2.14k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46k | £2.02k | £4.85k | £5.57k | £4.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 1995 as amended on 01 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE PARKSIDE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashbourne Primary School
Cokayne Avenue
ASHBOURNE
DE6 1EJ
- Phone:
- 01335 342891
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window