CHOICES CRISIS PREGNANCY COUNSELLING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pregnancy tests advice in crisis pregnancy situations help with post-abortion difficulties schools work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- CHOICES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.50k | £10.59k | £5.84k | £9.33k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £8.72k | £7.36k | £6.20k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 20 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 04 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 August 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL.(B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH(C) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PREGANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE.(D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONECTION WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window