Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST THOMAS' CHURCH WEST HYDE

Charity number: 1059344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required