WHEAT MENTOR SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1059386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.76k £12.01k £13.53k £2.00k £2.00k
Total expenditure £22.60k £19.69k £12.33k £2.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £250 £13.53k N/A N/A