Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1059388
Charity reporting is overdue by 225 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required