WHITECROFT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1059446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 15 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 28 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 28 May 2016 On time Download